PA HB56 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-12)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 6, 1987 (P.L.381, No.79), known as the Older Adults Protective Services Act, further defining "facility"; and further providing for reporting by employees, for reports to department and coroner and for penalties.
Title
Further defining "facility"; and further providing for reporting by employees, for reports to department and coroner and for penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - HB 56 PN 1194, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH | |
2009-03-30 | In the Senate | |
2009-03-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-25 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-25 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-24 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-23 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-23 | First consideration | |
2009-03-23 | Reported as amended | |
2009-01-26 | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |