PA HB558 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-01 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-01 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in volunteer firefighters, further providing for use of funds of a volunteer firefighters' relief association.
Title
In volunteer firefighters, further providing for use of funds of a volunteer firefighters' relief association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 558 PN 583, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 558 PN 583, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-01 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2017-11-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-11-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-11-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-25 | House | Second consideration |
2017-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-17 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |