PA HB55 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing separate and distinct amendments to the Constitution of Pennsylvania, in declaration of rights, providing for prohibition against denial or abridgment of equality of rights because of race and ethnicity; in legislation, further providing for action on concurrent orders and resolutions; and, in the executive, providing for disaster emergency declaration and management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing separate and distinct amendments to the Constitution of Pennsylvania, in declaration of rights, providing for prohibition against denial or abridgment of equality of rights because of race and ethnicity; in legislation, further providing for action on concurrent orders and resolutions; and, in the executive, providing for disaster emergency declaration and management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Floor: HB 55 PN 34, FP (Y: 116 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Floor: HB 55 PN 34, MCCLINTON, MOT PURS TO RULE 20 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 55 PN 34, MOT TABLE, MCCLINTON (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 55 PN 34, 2021 A170, DAVIDSON (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 55 PN 34, 2021 A163, BRADFORD (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 55 PN 34, 2021 A154, PISCIOTTANO (Y: 17 N: 185 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-01-27SenateIn the Senate
2021-01-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-86)
2021-01-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-01-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-01-26HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-13HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-13HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-13HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=55
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0055&pn=0034
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0055&pn=0034&aYear=2021&an=00170
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0055&pn=0034&aYear=2021&an=00163
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0055&pn=0034&aYear=2021&an=00154
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0055P0034.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/13/2021&RollCallId=9
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=10
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=11
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=12
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=13
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=16
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=17
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=90

Bill Comments

feedback