PA HB548 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for hearing examiners.
Title
Amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for hearing examiners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 548 PN 573, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 548 PN 573, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-03 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-21 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |