PA HB544 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for liability for landowners to recreational users; and providing for attorney fees and court costs.
Title
Amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for liability for landowners to recreational users; and providing for attorney fees and court costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 3018, FP (Y: 187 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 960, 2015 A4993, LONGIETTI (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 960, 2015 A4738, MOUL (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 3018, FP (Y: 187 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 960, 2015 A4993, LONGIETTI (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 960, 2015 A4738, MOUL (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2016-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-2) |
2016-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-22 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-22 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-02 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-28 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |