PA HB543 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-12)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-11 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-11 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 3, 1959 (P.L.1688, No.621), known as the Housing Finance Agency Law, establishing an energy-efficient home assistance program.
Title
An Act amending the act of December 3, 1959 (P.L.1688, No.621), known as the Housing Finance Agency Law, establishing an energy-efficient home assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-11 | Removed from table | |
2007-05-23 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-23 | First consideration | |
2007-05-23 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-06 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=543 |