PA HB537 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-05-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-05-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 26, 2001 (P.L.755, No.77), known as the Tobacco Settlement Act, adding definitions; further providing for the Health Venture Investment Account; establishing the Biotechnology Commercialization Account; further providing for the investment of fund and accounts; providing for authorized investment for the Biotechnology Commercialization Account; and further providing for use of the Tobacco Settlement Fund and for regional biotechnology research centers.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 26, 2001 (P.L.755, No.77), known as the Tobacco Settlement Act, adding definitions; further providing for the Health Venture Investment Account; establishing the Biotechnology Commercialization Account; further providing for the investment of fund and accounts; providing for authorized investment for the Biotechnology Commercialization Account; and further providing for use of the Tobacco Settlement Fund and for regional biotechnology research centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-05-21 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-21 | Removed from table | |
2007-05-08 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-08 | First consideration | |
2007-05-08 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-06 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=537 |