PA HB532 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-20)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act providing mandatory insurance coverage for general anesthesia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing mandatory insurance coverage for general anesthesia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-30 - Senate - HB 532 PN 3601, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - HB 532 PN 3601, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-05SenateAct No. 94
2012-07-05SenateApproved by the Governor
2012-06-30SenatePresented to the Governor
2012-06-30SenateSigned in Senate
2012-06-30SenateSigned in House
2012-06-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2012-06-25SenateSecond consideration
2012-06-20SenateFirst consideration
2012-06-20SenateReported as committed
2012-06-15SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2012-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2012-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2012-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-06-11HouseSecond consideration
2012-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2012-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2012-05-23HouseFirst consideration
2012-05-23HouseReported as amended
2011-02-08HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=532
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0532&pn=0499
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0532&pn=3601
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1563
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/20/2012&rNbr=1105
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=776

Bill Comments 750

feedback