PA HB527 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in public improvements, utilities and services, providing for public notice, public meeting and consent requirements.
Title
In public improvements, utilities and services, providing for public notice, public meeting and consent requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 527 PN 2205, 2021 A3308 (Y: 177 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02423 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 527 PN 2205, 2021 A3308 (Y: 177 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02423 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-01-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-29 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-11 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |