PA HB516 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the practice of naturopathic medicine; providing for the issuance of licenses and the suspension and revocation of licenses; and providing for penalties.
Title
Relating to the practice of naturopathic medicine; providing for the issuance of licenses and the suspension and revocation of licenses; and providing for penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 516 PN 4043, CONCUR (Y: 183 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 516 PN 4043, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Floor: HB 516 PN 1053, FP (Y: 169 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A00294 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A00294 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 516 PN 4043, CONCUR (Y: 183 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 516 PN 4043, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Floor: HB 516 PN 1053, FP (Y: 169 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A00294 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A00294 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | House | Act No. 128 |
2016-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (183-7) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-25 | House | In the House |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (169-25) |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-21 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-01 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |