PA HB504 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.789, No.285), known as The Insurance Department Act of 1921, in insurance producers, further providing for definitions and providing for self-service storage insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In insurance producers, further providing for definitions and providing for self-service storage insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 504 PN 3297, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 3297, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A06211 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A06265 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-01SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-09-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-26SenateSecond consideration
2018-09-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-25SenateReported as committed
2018-04-30SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2018-04-17SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-04-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-16HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-09HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-09HouseReported as amended
2017-02-15HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=504
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0504&pn=0530
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0504&pn=3297
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1357
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1356
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1358
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/17/2018&RollCallId=1453
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1089
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1145
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=727

Bill Comments

feedback