PA HB502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in crime victims, further providing for rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In crime victims, further providing for rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 502 PN 490, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 502 PN 490, FP (Y: 197 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateAct No. 23
2019-06-28SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-20SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-19SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-19SenateSigned in House
2019-06-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as committed
2019-04-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-04-08SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-1)
2019-04-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-11HouseSecond consideration
2019-02-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-21HouseReported as committed
2019-02-12HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=502
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0502&pn=0490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=02/21/2019&RollCallId=48
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=149
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=247
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=264
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=160

Bill Comments

feedback