PA HB499 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in certification of teachers, further providing for evaluation of applications for certification.
Title
In certification of teachers, further providing for evaluation of applications for certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 499 PN 1425, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00879 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00879 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 499 PN 1425, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00879 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00879 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2015-05-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-06 | House | Second consideration |
2015-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |