PA HB491 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the exclusion of veterans' benefit payments from income for Commonwealth programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the exclusion of veterans' benefit payments from income for Commonwealth programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 491 PN 934, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00388 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-01-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-11-09SenateFirst consideration
2021-11-09SenateReported as committed
2021-03-25SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-03-24SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-23HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-16HouseReported as amended
2021-02-09HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=491
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0491&pn=0454
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0491&pn=0934
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0491P0934.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=127
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=128
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=108
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=244
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=11/09/2021&RollCallId=639

Bill Comments

feedback