PA HB49 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school security, further providing for definitions, for school police officers, for training, for powers and duties, for school resource officers and for school security guards; in high schools, further providing for courses of study; in miscellaneous provisions relating to institutions of higher education, further providing for Public Higher Education Funding Commission; and, in fostering independence through education, further providing for fostering independence waiver program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In school security, further providing for definitions, for school police officers, for training, for powers and duties, for school resource officers and for school security guards; in high schools, further providing for courses of study; in miscellaneous provisions relating to institutions of higher education, further providing for Public Higher Education Funding Commission; and, in fostering independence through education, further providing for fostering independence waiver program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 49 PN 2893, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HB 49 PN 2893, CONCUR (Y: 161 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A03809 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 49 PN 2740, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 49 PN 2740, A3339, MOTION TO TABLE SANTARSIERO AMENDMENT NO. A-3339 (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 49 PN 2740, A3378, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-3378 (Y: 21 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 49 PN 2740, A3335, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-3335 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 49 PN 1972, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 49 PN 1610, 2019 A891, BROWN (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00821 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-27SenateAct No. 91
2019-11-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-11-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-11-21SenateSigned in Senate
2019-11-21SenateSigned in House
2019-11-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (35-14)
2019-11-21SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-11-19SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-11-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-19HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (161-37)
2019-11-18HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2019-10-28HouseReferred to RULES
2019-10-23HouseIn the House
2019-10-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (28-20)
2019-10-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-10-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-22SenateSecond consideration
2019-10-21SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-21SenateReported as amended
2019-07-08SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-03HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-05-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-29HouseReported as amended
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=49
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0049&pn=0061
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0049&pn=1610
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0049&pn=1972
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0049&pn=2740
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0049&pn=2893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=362
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=363
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=605
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=975
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=10/21/2019&RollCallId=519
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=290
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=291
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=292
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=293
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/23/2019&RollCallId=564
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1347
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1346
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=857
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=368
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/21/2019&RollCallId=685

Bill Comments

feedback