PA HB49 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-10)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-26 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on January 30 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-26 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act providing for medical assistance to certain eligible women for breast and cervical cancer treatment and follow-up care and for the powers and duties of the Department of Public Welfare.
Title
An Act providing for medical assistance to certain eligible women for breast and cervical cancer treatment and follow-up care and for the powers and duties of the Department of Public Welfare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-26 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-20 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-20 | First consideration | |
2007-06-20 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=49 |