PA HB488 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of endangering welfare of children.
Title
In offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of endangering welfare of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 488 PN 2239, FP (Y: 155 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 488 PN 451, 2021 A1197 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 488 PN 2239, FP (Y: 155 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 488 PN 451, 2021 A1197 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (155-44) |
2021-10-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-10-04 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |