PA HB488 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-31)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on February 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, further providing for exclusions from sales tax and for exemption certificates.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, further providing for exclusions from sales tax and for exemption certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-15 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-15 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-04 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2008-06-04 | First consideration | |
2008-06-04 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-26 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=488 |