PA HB487 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-15)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-25 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-25 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Summary
An Act providing for notice of motor vehicle event data recorders and for information retrieval; imposing penalties; and providing for evidentiary rules.
Title
An Act providing for notice of motor vehicle event data recorders and for information retrieval; imposing penalties; and providing for evidentiary rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-25 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-09-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-09-24 | Second consideration | |
2007-07-12 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-25 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-25 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-24 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-24 | First consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Reported as amended | |
2007-02-26 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=487 |