PA HB481 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in corporate powers, further providing for municipal authorities and cooperation with other political subdivisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In corporate powers, further providing for municipal authorities and cooperation with other political subdivisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 481 PN 505, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-04-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-24SenateReported as committed
2018-04-11SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-04-10SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2018-01-24HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-29HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-28HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as committed
2017-02-14HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=481
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0481&pn=0505
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=410
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/11/2017&RollCallId=883
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1065
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=04/24/2018&RollCallId=797

Bill Comments

feedback