PA HB48 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 72 (Taxation and Fiscal Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for financial transparency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for financial transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Floor: HB 48 PN 27, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 48 PN 27, 2021 A646, T. DAVIS (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateReferred to FINANCE
2021-04-19SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-04-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-07HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-06HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-24HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=48
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0048&pn=0027
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0048P0027.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=223
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=141
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=154
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/19/2021&RollCallId=312

Bill Comments

feedback