PA HB479 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in intergovernmental cooperation, further providing for ordinance, for content of ordinance, for joint purchases with private educational establishments, for required review of specified agreements and for effect of joint cooperation agreements.
Title
In intergovernmental cooperation, further providing for ordinance, for content of ordinance, for joint purchases with private educational establishments, for required review of specified agreements and for effect of joint cooperation agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 479 PN 503, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 479 PN 503, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-04-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2018-01-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-25 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-10 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |