PA HB478 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for outpatient psychiatric oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for outpatient psychiatric oversight.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 478 PN 3434, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 478 PN 3434, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 478 PN 502, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseAct No. 25
2018-05-31HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-05-21HousePresented to the Governor
2018-05-21HouseSigned in Senate
2018-05-01HouseSigned in House
2018-05-01HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (190-0)
2018-05-01HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-04-30HouseReferred to RULES
2018-04-25HouseIn the House
2018-04-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-04-24SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-04-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-03-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-20SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-19SenateRemoved from table
2017-12-13SenateLaid on the table
2017-11-14SenateFirst consideration
2017-11-14SenateReported as amended
2017-03-24SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-03-22SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-03-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-21HouseSecond consideration
2017-03-20HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-13HouseReported as committed
2017-02-14HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=478
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0478&pn=0502
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0478&pn=2699
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0478&pn=3434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/13/2017&RollCallId=75
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=112
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=167
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=11/14/2017&RollCallId=542
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/23/2018&RollCallId=792
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=481
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1217
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1514

Bill Comments

feedback