PA HB477 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in public improvements, utilities and services, providing for public notice and public meeting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public improvements, utilities and services, providing for public notice and public meeting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - House - House Floor: HB 477 PN 1711, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00535 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-15SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-09-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-09-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-11HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as amended
2017-02-13HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=477
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0477&pn=0497
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0477&pn=1711
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=407
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=667
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/12/2017&RollCallId=884

Bill Comments

feedback