PA HB476 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in general provisions, further providing for powers and duties of the department.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for powers and duties of the department.
Sponsors
Rep. Zachary Mako [R] | Rep. Marcia Hahn [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Tina Davis [D] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 476 PN 1455, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A00702 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 476 PN 1455, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A00702 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-29 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |