PA HB475 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 17, 1968 (P.L.1224, No.387), known as the Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Law, further providing for private actions.
Title
Further providing for private actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |