PA HB470 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other criminal provisions, further providing for supervisory relationship to offenders.
Title
In other criminal provisions, further providing for supervisory relationship to offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Floor: HB 470 PN 2276, FP (Y: 198 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03320 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03320 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Floor: HB 470 PN 2276, FP (Y: 198 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03320 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03320 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-10-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-2) |
2015-10-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-06 | House | Second consideration |
2015-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-30 | House | First consideration |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |