PA HB466 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 74-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-20 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-20 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, as follows: In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions. In Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of board. In Pennsylvania liquor stores, providing for career training and postsecondary education grant eligibility. In licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for license districts, license period and hearings and for issuance, transfer or extension of hotel, restaurant and club liquor licenses, providing for wholesale permit, for wholesale licenses, for wine or liquor expanded permits and for wine or liquor enhanced permits; further providing for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt and brewed beverages retail licenses, for application for distributors', importing distributors' and retail dispensers' licenses, for prohibitions against the grant of licenses, for interlocking business prohibited, for licenses not assignable and transfers, for surrender of restaurant, eating place retail dispenser, hotel, importing distributor and distributor license for benefit of licensee and for unlawful acts relative to malt or brewed beverages and licensees.
Title
As follows: In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions. In Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of board. In Pennsylvania liquor stores, providing for career training and postsecondary education grant eligibility. In licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for license districts, license period and hearings and for issuance, transfer or extension of hotel, restaurant and club liquor licenses, providing for wholesale permit, for wholesale licenses, for wine or liquor expanded permits and for wine or liquor enhanced permits; further providing for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt and brewed beverages retail licenses, for application for distributors', importing distributors' and retail dispensers' licenses, for prohibitions against the grant of licenses, for interlocking business prohibited, for licenses not assignable and transfers, for surrender of restaurant, eating place retail dispenser, hotel, importing distributor and distributor license for benefit of licensee and for unlawful acts relative to malt or brewed beverages and licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 466 PN 1985, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 466 PN 1985, A2908, BREWSTER AMENDMENT NO. A-2908 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 466 PN 1985, CONCUR (Y: 113 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Floor: HB 466 PN 521, FP (Y: 114 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 466 PN 1985, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 466 PN 1985, A2908, BREWSTER AMENDMENT NO. A-2908 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 466 PN 1985, CONCUR (Y: 113 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Floor: HB 466 PN 521, FP (Y: 114 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | Senate | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table |
2015-07-02 | Senate | In the House |
2015-07-02 | House | Veto No. 2 |
2015-07-02 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2015-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (113-82) |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-06-30 | House | In the House |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (27-22) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2015-02-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (114-87) |
2015-02-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-25 | House | Second consideration |
2015-02-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-13 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 521 |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |