PA HB463 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-18)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Act No. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-18)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Act No. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in Pharmaceutical Assistance for the Elderly, further providing for determination of eligibility.
Title
In Pharmaceutical Assistance for the Elderly, further providing for determination of eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - House - HB 463 PN 2226, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - HB 463 PN 2226, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - HB 463 PN 1522, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - HB 463 PN 2226, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - HB 463 PN 1522, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | House | Act No. 21 |
2011-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2011-06-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2011-06-29 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2011-06-28 | House | Referred to RULES |
2011-06-28 | House | In the House |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2011-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2011-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2011-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-25 | House | Second consideration |
2011-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-04 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |