PA HB461 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, further providing for establishment of Human Services Block Grant Pilot Program.
Title
Further providing for establishment of Human Services Block Grant Pilot Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2013-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-07-15 | House | Removed from table |
2013-07-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-11 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to HEALTH |