PA HB46 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, providing for contributions for pediatric cancer research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, providing for contributions for pediatric cancer research.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 46 PN 1033, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 46 PN 1033, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A00287 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-30SenateAct No. 39
2017-10-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-10-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-10-25SenateSigned in Senate
2017-10-25SenateSigned in House
2017-10-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-10-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-12SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-12SenateSecond consideration
2017-05-24SenateFirst consideration
2017-05-24SenateReported as committed
2017-04-06SenateReferred to FINANCE
2017-04-05SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-04-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-04HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-03HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-21HouseReported as amended
2017-02-07HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=46
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0046&pn=0374
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0046&pn=1033
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=102
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=103
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/05/2017&RollCallId=212
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=155
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=199
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/23/2017&RollCallId=505
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=315

Bill Comments

feedback