PA HB456 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act regulating tattoo, body-piercing and corrective cosmetic artists; limiting tongue splitting; providing for powers and duties of the Department of Health; and imposing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating tattoo, body-piercing and corrective cosmetic artists; limiting tongue splitting; providing for powers and duties of the Department of Health; and imposing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 456 PN 3313, FP (Y: 173 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 456 PN 2771, 2017 A6105, R. BROWN (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 456 PN 2771, 2017 A6104, R. BROWN (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 456 PN 2771, 2017 A6096, NELSON (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 456 PN 2771, 2017 A5765, MACKENZIE (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04953 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-04-11SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (173-17)
2018-04-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-04HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-04HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-04HouseReported as amended
2017-02-13HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=456
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0456&pn=0477
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0456&pn=2771
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0456&pn=3313
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=12/04/2017&RollCallId=1085
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=12/04/2017&RollCallId=1086
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1073
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1074
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1075
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1076
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1095
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/11/2018&RollCallId=1402

Bill Comments

feedback