PA HB454 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for definitions; and providing for pharmacy technician and pharmacy technician trainee registration, qualifications and supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions; and providing for pharmacy technician and pharmacy technician trainee registration, qualifications and supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 454 PN 1549, FP (Y: 178 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A00577 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-05-09SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (178-16)
2017-05-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-08HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-25HouseReported as amended
2017-02-13HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=454
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0454&pn=0475
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0454&pn=1549
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=287
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=286
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=326
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=385

Bill Comments

feedback