PA HB444 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in nomination of candidates, further providing for manner of signing nomination petitions and time of circulating, for number of signers required for nomination petitions of candidates at primaries and for nominations by political bodies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In nomination of candidates, further providing for manner of signing nomination petitions and time of circulating, for number of signers required for nomination petitions of candidates at primaries and for nominations by political bodies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 444 PN 2589, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 444 PN 460, 2017 A3839, CALTAGIRONE (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 444 PN 460, 2017 A3839, SUSP RULES, CALTAGIRONE (Y: 183 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-03-19SenateRemoved from table
2018-03-19SenateLaid on the table
2017-12-12SenateFirst consideration
2017-12-12SenateReported as amended
2017-12-01SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-11-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-11-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-10-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-16HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-10-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-03HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-03HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-03HouseReported as committed
2017-02-10HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=444
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0444&pn=0460
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0444&pn=2589
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0444&pn=2818
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=10/03/2017&RollCallId=927
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=749
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=750
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=1009
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=845
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=583

Bill Comments

feedback