PA HB442 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for plumbing contractors licensure; establishing the State Board of Plumbing Contractors and providing for its powers and duties; conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Labor and Industry; establishing fees, fines and civil penalties; establishing the Plumbing Contractors Licensure Account; and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for plumbing contractors licensure; establishing the State Board of Plumbing Contractors and providing for its powers and duties; conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Labor and Industry; establishing fees, fines and civil penalties; establishing the Plumbing Contractors Licensure Account; and making an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 442 PN 1929, FP (Y: 105 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 442 PN 1929, MOT POSTPONE, KINSEY (Y: 75 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 442 PN 1929, 2017 A1928, CHRISTIANA (Y: 157 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A01517 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-20HouseFinal passage (105-91)
2017-06-20HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2017-06-20HouseThird consideration rescinded
2017-06-13HouseThird consideration
2017-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-12HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-07HouseReported as amended
2017-02-10HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=442
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0442&pn=0458
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0442&pn=1929
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0442&pn=2086
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=486
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=590
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=615
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=520
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=521
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=522

Bill Comments

feedback