PA HB442 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-06 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-06 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 30, 1996 (P.L.732, No.131), known as the Pennsylvania Innkeepers' Rights Act, providing for prospective employee background checks; and requiring deadbolt locks in hotels.
Title
Providing for prospective employee background checks; and requiring deadbolt locks in hotels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-06 | Removed from table | |
2010-10-06 | Laid on the table | |
2010-07-01 | Second consideration | |
2010-07-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-04-28 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-28 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-27 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-27 | First consideration | |
2010-04-27 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |