PA HB441 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-15)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 61 in Schuylkill County, from State Route 443 to State Route 2014, as the Captain Jason B. Jones Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 61 in Schuylkill County, from State Route 443 to State Route 2014, as the Captain Jason B. Jones Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 441 PN 1675, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00930 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00930 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 441 PN 1675, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00930 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00930 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-06-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2015-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-10 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-01 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-13 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 520 |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |