PA HB44 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in protection from abuse, further providing for commencement of proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In protection from abuse, further providing for commencement of proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 44 PN 400, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 44 PN 400, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 44 PN 50, 2017 A52, MARSICO (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 92
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-01SenateRemoved from table
2018-10-01SenateLaid on the table
2018-06-13SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-12SenateReported as committed
2017-02-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-02-08SenateIn the Senate
2017-02-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2017-02-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-02-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-01-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-01-25HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=44
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0044&pn=0050
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0044&pn=0400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/25/2017&RollCallId=13
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=24
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=42
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/08/2017&RollCallId=66
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=930
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=719

Bill Comments

feedback