PA HB436 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the annual designation and holiday observance of the fifteenth day of the Hindu lunisolar month of Kartik as "Diwali Day" in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for the annual designation and holiday observance of the fifteenth day of the Hindu lunisolar month of Kartik as "Diwali Day" in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 436 PN 403, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 436 PN 403, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-1) |
2023-04-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-04-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-04-25 | House | Second consideration |
2023-04-24 | House | Removed from table |
2023-04-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-04-24 | House | First consideration |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |