PA HB427 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in Pennsylvania liquor stores, further providing for sales by Pennsylvania liquor stores.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania liquor stores, further providing for sales by Pennsylvania liquor stores.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 427 PN 939, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00434 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-28SenateSecond consideration
2021-04-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-27SenateReported as committed
2021-04-09SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2021-04-05SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-04-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-23HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-16HouseReported as amended
2021-02-08HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=427
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0427&pn=0404
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0427&pn=0939
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0427P0939.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=134
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=132
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=117
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/05/2021&RollCallId=260
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=04/27/2021&RollCallId=143

Bill Comments 750

feedback