PA HB427 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for health insurance coverage requirements for stage four, advanced metastatic cancer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for health insurance coverage requirements for stage four, advanced metastatic cancer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00422 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-27HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-25HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-25HouseReported as amended
2019-02-11HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback