PA HB423 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of July 12, 1935 (P.L.970, No.314), entitled "An act imposing a graduated income tax for school purposes on residents of Pennsylvania including fiduciaries and on income of nonresidents derived from property or business in Pennsylvania; defining taxable income and requiring filing of returns thereof; providing for the assessment, collection and lien of said tax and for the disposition of proceeds thereof; providing for administration and enforcement of the act by the Department of Revenue; conferring powers and imposing duties on certain persons, partnerships, associations, corporations, school districts, State officers, employes and departments; imposing penalties; and appropriating the revenues derived from said tax."
Title
Repealing the act of July 12, 1935 (P.L.970, No.314), entitled "An act imposing a graduated income tax for school purposes on residents of Pennsylvania including fiduciaries and on income of nonresidents derived from property or business in Pennsylvania; defining taxable income and requiring filing of returns thereof; providing for the assessment, collection and lien of said tax and for the disposition of proceeds thereof; providing for administration and enforcement of the act by the Department of Revenue; conferring powers and imposing duties on certain persons, partnerships, associations, corporations, school districts, State officers, employes and departments; imposing penalties; and appropriating the revenues derived from said tax."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Floor: HB 423 PN 400, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Floor: HB 423 PN 400, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-04-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-07 | House | Second consideration |
2021-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-24 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to FINANCE |