PA HB416 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, providing for seizure recognition and related first aid training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In school health services, providing for seizure recognition and related first aid training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 416 PN 2322, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 416 PN 2322, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 416 PN 963, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Floor: HB 416 PN 394, 2021 A392, THOMAS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-17HouseAct No. 84
2021-11-17HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-11-10HousePresented to the Governor
2021-11-09HouseSigned in Senate
2021-11-09HouseSigned in House
2021-11-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (200-0)
2021-11-09HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-11-09HouseReferred to RULES
2021-11-08HouseIn the House
2021-11-08SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2021-10-26SenateRe-reported as amended
2021-10-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-10-26SenateSecond consideration
2021-10-25SenateRemoved from table
2021-06-14SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2021-05-10SenateFirst consideration
2021-05-10SenateReported as amended
2021-03-22SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2021-03-22SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-03-16HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-11HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-11HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-11HouseReported as committed
2021-02-04HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=416
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0416&pn=0394
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0416&pn=0963
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0416&pn=1494
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0416&pn=2322
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0416P0963.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0416P2322.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0416P2322.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/02/2021&RollCallId=114
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=66
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=77
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/22/2021&RollCallId=187
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=05/10/2021&RollCallId=177
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=341
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/09/2021&RollCallId=1033
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=579

Bill Comments

feedback