PA HB412 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Act No. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for special provisions applicable to limited school years; in professional employees, providing for day-to-day substitutes; in certification of teachers, further providing for substitute teaching permit for prospective teachers, for program of continuing professional education and for locally issued temporary certification for substitute teachers and providing for permit for classroom monitors and for substitute teaching policy; and, in Safe2Say Program, further providing for false reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, providing for special provisions applicable to limited school years; in professional employees, providing for day-to-day substitutes; in certification of teachers, further providing for substitute teaching permit for prospective teachers, for program of continuing professional education and for locally issued temporary certification for substitute teachers and providing for permit for classroom monitors and for substitute teaching policy; and, in Safe2Say Program, further providing for false reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 412 PN 2533, Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 412 PN 2533, CONCUR (Y: 168 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 412 PN 845, 2021 A32330, PHILLIPS-HILL Amendment No. A-3233 Reconsidered (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 412 PN 845, 2021 A32330, PHILLIPS-HILL Amendment No. A-3233 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 412 PN 845, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00366 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-17HouseAct No. 91
2021-12-17HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-12-16HousePresented to the Governor
2021-12-15HouseSigned in Senate
2021-12-15HouseSigned in House
2021-12-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (168-32)
2021-12-15HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-12-15HouseReferred to RULES
2021-12-15HouseIn the House
2021-12-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (37-13)
2021-12-14SenateAmended on third consideration (34-15)
2021-12-14SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-05-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-11SenateSecond consideration
2021-05-10SenateFirst consideration
2021-05-10SenateReported as committed
2021-03-22SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2021-03-22SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-17HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-16HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-11HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-11HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-11HouseReported as amended
2021-02-04HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=412
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0412&pn=0390
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0412&pn=0845
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0412&pn=2533
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0412P0845.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0412P0845.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0412P2533.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/02/2021&RollCallId=113
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/02/2021&RollCallId=112
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=76
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/22/2021&RollCallId=186
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=05/10/2021&RollCallId=176
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=391
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=392
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=681
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=395
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=12/15/2021&RollCallId=1195

Bill Comments

feedback