PA HB411 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 10, 1981 (P.L.214, No.67), known as the Bingo Law, further providing for definitions, for rules for licensing and operation and for penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for rules for licensing and operation and for penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 411 PN 1014, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 411 PN 1014, FP (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-22SenateAct No. 66
2017-12-22SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-13SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-13SenateSigned in Senate
2017-12-13SenateSigned in House
2017-12-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-11-14SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-11-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-11-13SenateRemoved from table
2017-09-20SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-07-08SenateRemoved from table
2017-07-08SenateLaid on the table
2017-07-08SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-13SenateReported as committed
2017-05-15SenateReferred to FINANCE
2017-05-09SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-2)
2017-05-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-08HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-25HouseReported as committed
2017-03-20HouseReferred to GAMING OVERSIGHT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=411
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0411&pn=1014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=54&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=295
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=324
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=384
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=262
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/14/2017&RollCallId=550
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=368

Bill Comments

feedback