PA HB409 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-14 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-14 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in mental health: departmental powers and duties, commissioner of mental health, interstate compact, reciprocal agreements and research foundation, providing for mental health care services clearinghouse; and making an editorial change.
Title
In mental health: departmental powers and duties, commissioner of mental health, interstate compact, reciprocal agreements and research foundation, providing for mental health care services clearinghouse; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 1748, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 382, 2021 A1525, GALLOWAY (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 1748, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 382, 2021 A1525, GALLOWAY (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-06-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |