PA HB407 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for contributions for pediatric cancer research and establishing the Pediatric Cancer Research Fund.
Title
In registration of vehicles, providing for contributions for pediatric cancer research and establishing the Pediatric Cancer Research Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 407 PN 2011, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01751 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01751 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 407 PN 2011, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01751 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01751 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |