PA HB406 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in compensation, further providing for qualifications required to secure compensation.
Title
In compensation, further providing for qualifications required to secure compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 406 PN 1372, FP (Y: 130 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 406 PN 1372, 2021 A939, MULLERY (Y: 87 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 406 PN 1372, FP (Y: 130 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 406 PN 1372, 2021 A939, MULLERY (Y: 87 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (130-71) |
2021-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |