PA HB406 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in public improvements, utilities and services, providing for public notice and public meeting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public improvements, utilities and services, providing for public notice and public meeting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 406 PN 2831, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03610 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2020-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2020-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2020-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-02-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-02-03HouseSecond consideration
2020-01-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-30HouseReported as amended
2019-04-02HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=406
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0406&pn=1145
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0406&pn=2831
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=10/30/2019&RollCallId=1333
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=10/30/2019&RollCallId=1332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1107
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2020&RollCallId=1720

Bill Comments

feedback