PA HB406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions and for filing of claim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions and for filing of claim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-19HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-19HouseReported as committed
2017-03-20HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback